This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

StoneCastle Cash Management LLC v. Island Intellectual Property LLC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 StoneCastle Cash Management LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Island Intellectual Property LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07868

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

StoneCastle Cash Management LLC

Defendant

Island Intellectual Property LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Bekier

333 S Grand Ave, Ste 54Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Florina Yezril

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Brian A. Rosenthal

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Josh Andrew Krevitt

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Katherine Quinn Dominguez

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Defendant Attorneys

John Dellaportas

Attorney at Emmet, Marvin & Martin LLP

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

Beth Claire Khinchuk

Attorney at Emmet, Marvin & Martin LLP

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

25 #6

Exhibit F

25 #5

Exhibit E

25 #4

Exhibit D

25 #3

Exhibit C

25 #1

Exhibit A

#25

#24

1 #70

Exhibit 70 - 2020-08-12 (NYS 022) SC Motion to Dismiss State Court Complaint

1 #69

Exhibit 69 - 2020-06-25 (NYS 002) IIP State Court Complaint

1 #68

Exhibit 68 - 2020-06-25 (SDNY 060) IIP Letter to Judge Oetken

1 #67

Exhibit 67 - 2020-05-29 (SDNY 058) Opinion and Order re Motion to Dismiss

1 #66

Exhibit 66 - 2019-09-11 (SDNY 051) SC Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss

1 #65

Exhibit 65 - 2019-09-04 (SDNY 049) IIP Opp to Motion to Dismiss

1 #64

Exhibit 64 - 2019-08-05 (SDNY 041) SC Motion to Dismiss

1 #63

Exhibit 63 - 2019-05-24 (SDNY 013) 2019 Complaint

1 #61

Exhibit 61 - 2018-11-20 Letter from IIP to SC

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2020. (ama) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER: granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss. addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Kate Dominguez dated November 17, 2020. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by December 22, 2020. Plaintiff will not be given any further opportunity to amend the complaint to address issues raised by the motion to dismiss. If Plaintiff does amend, by three (3) weeks after the amended complaint is filed, Defendant shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) file a letter on ECF stating that it relies on the previously filed motion to dismiss. If Defendant files an answer or a new motion to dismiss, the Court will deny the previously filed motion to dismiss as moot. If Defendant files a new motion to dismiss, any opposition shall be filed within fourteen days, and any reply shall be filed within seven days of any opposition. If no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by December 22, 2020. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be filed by January 5, 2021. Finally, it is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for January 7, 2021 is adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 26. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 12/22/2020 Replies due by 1/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/17/2020) (ama) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Kate Dominguez dated November 17, 2020. Document filed by StoneCastle Cash Management LLC..(Dominguez, Katherine) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Bruce R. Bent II in Support re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Island Intellectual Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Dellaportas, John) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Island Intellectual Property LLC..(Dellaportas, John) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Motion. Document filed by Island Intellectual Property LLC..(Dellaportas, John) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: The Assignment Committee has decided to reassign this case to the undersigned. For avoidance of doubt, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 7, 2021 as described the Court's Order of September 24, 2020, ECF No. 12, is REINSTATED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/16/2020) (cf) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge J. Paul Oetken is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from John Dellaportas dated 11/04/2020 re: Transfer Request. Document filed by Island Intellectual Property LLC..(Dellaportas, John) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Josh Krevitt dated 10/29/2020 re: Response to Defendant's October 27 letter. Document filed by StoneCastle Cash Management LLC..(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for JORDAN BEKIER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21814630. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for JORDAN BEKIER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21814630. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by StoneCastle Cash Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jordan Bekier, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bekier, Jordan) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian A. Rosenthal on behalf of StoneCastle Cash Management LLC..(Rosenthal, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Florina Yezril on behalf of StoneCastle Cash Management LLC..(Yezril, Florina) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Quinn Dominguez on behalf of StoneCastle Cash Management LLC..(Dominguez, Katherine) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Island Intellectual Property LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by StoneCastle Cash Management LLC..(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-CV-4792-JPO. Document filed by StoneCastle Cash Management LLC..(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against StoneCastle Cash Management LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21812849)Document filed by StoneCastle Cash Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US7509286, #2 Exhibit 2 - US7519551, #3 Exhibit 3 - US7536350, #4 Exhibit 4 - US7668771, #5 Exhibit 5 - US7668772, #6 Exhibit 6 - US7672886, #7 Exhibit 7 - US7672901, #8 Exhibit 8 - US7672902, #9 Exhibit 9 - US7680716, #10 Exhibit 10 - US7680734, #11 Exhibit 11 - US7716131, #12 Exhibit 12 - US7752107, #13 Exhibit 13 - US7752129, #14 Exhibit 14 - US7769688, #15 Exhibit 15 - US7809640, #16 Exhibit 16 - US7933821, #17 Exhibit 17 - US7996308, #18 Exhibit 18 - US8019667, #19 Exhibit 19 - US8019668, #20 Exhibit 20 - US8032456, #21 Exhibit 21 - US8239321, #22 Exhibit 22 - US8260697, #23 Exhibit 23 - US8260705, #24 Exhibit 24 - US8290859, #25 Exhibit 25 - US8290860, #26 Exhibit 26 - US8290861, #27 Exhibit 27 - US8311916, #28 Exhibit 28 - US8311939, #29 Exhibit 29 - US8352342, #30 Exhibit 30 - US8355985, #31 Exhibit 31 - US8370236, #32 Exhibit 32 - US8380621, #33 Exhibit 33 - US8386382, #34 Exhibit 34 - US8386383, #35 Exhibit 35 - US8401962, #36 Exhibit 36 - US8452702, #37 Exhibit 37 - US8458089, #38 Exhibit 38 - US8498933, #39 Exhibit 39 - US8521569, #40 Exhibit 40 - US8560442, #41 Exhibit 41 - US8566200, #42 Exhibit 42 - US8566201, #43 Exhibit 43 - US8571960, #44 Exhibit 44 - US8571984, #45 Exhibit 45 - US8583545, #46 Exhibit 46 - US8589289, #47 Exhibit 47 - US8606676, #48 Exhibit 48 - US8612324, #49 Exhibit 49 - US8688577, #50 Exhibit 50 - US8719062, #51 Exhibit 51 - USRE43246, #52 Exhibit 52 - US6374231, #53 Exhibit 53 - US8150766, #54 Exhibit 54 - US8359267, #55 Exhibit 55 - US8712911, #56 Exhibit 56 - US8719157, #57 Exhibit 57 - US8655689, #58 Exhibit 58 - Maier et al, Patent Protection Provides Long-term Net Strategy, #59 Exhibit 59 - 2018-10-29 Letter from IIP to SCP, #60 Exhibit 60 - 2018-11-13 Letter from SC to IIP, #61 Exhibit 61 - 2018-11-20 Letter from IIP to SC, #62 Exhibit 62 - 2018-12-04 Letter from SC to IIP, #63 Exhibit 63 - 2019-05-24 (SDNY 013) 2019 Complaint, #64 Exhibit 64 - 2019-08-05 (SDNY 041) SC Motion to Dismiss, #65 Exhibit 65 - 2019-09-04 (SDNY 049) IIP Opp to Motion to Dismiss, #66 Exhibit 66 - 2019-09-11 (SDNY 051) SC Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss, #67 Exhibit 67 - 2020-05-29 (SDNY 058) Opinion and Order re Motion to Dismiss, #68 Exhibit 68 - 2020-06-25 (SDNY 060) IIP Letter to Judge Oetken, #69 Exhibit 69 - 2020-06-25 (NYS 002) IIP State Court Complaint, #70 Exhibit 70 - 2020-08-12 (NYS 022) SC Motion to Dismiss State Court Complaint, #71 Exhibit 71 - 2020-08-12 (NYS 012) SCFC Motion to Dismiss State Court Complaint, #72 Exhibit 72 - 1975-01-26 Opinion Letter issued by the SEC, No. 74-1324, #73 Exhibit 73 - 1983-06-22 Interp Letter issued by the Federal Reserve, #74 Exhibit 74 - 1984-11-16 Interp Letter issued by the Federal Reserve, #75 Exhibit 75 - 1985-01-08 Opinion Letter issued by the SEC, #76 Exhibit 76 - 1986-05-22 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 86-15, #77 Exhibit 77 - 1986-07-23 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 86-21, #78 Exhibit 78 - 1986-08-11 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 86-22, #79 Exhibit 79 - 1986-08-15 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 86-23, #80 Exhibit 80 - 1986-10-20 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 86-31, #81 Exhibit 81 - 1988-08-31 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 88-56, #82 Exhibit 82 - 1989-06-19 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 89-19, #83 Exhibit 83 - 1990-08-09 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 90-34, #84 Exhibit 84 - 1994-04-01 Interp Letter issued by FDIC, No. 94-18, #85 Exhibit 85 - 1994-06-24 Interp Letter issued by the Federal Reserve).(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Bekier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Q. Dominguez