This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:34:34 (UTC).

Stoneburner et al v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Stoneburner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Property Casualty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01432

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kristina Stoneburner

Clifford Stoneburner

Defendant

United Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Galen M Hair

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys

3540 S I-10 Sevice Rd W Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Mary Kate Taliancich

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys

3540 S I-10 Sevice Rd W Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher K Jones

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Courtney Lehan Fournet

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Virginia J McLin

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co.(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Christopher K Jones on behalf of United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/24/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

6 #1

Proposed order

#6

(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party United Property & Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified on 6/10/2021 to create docket entry relationship (Miletello, A). (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford Stoneburner, Kristina Stoneburner. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (aty,Taliancich, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#2

(#1) FILED IN ERROR. RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY AT DOC 2. COMPLAINT against United Property & Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4685987) filed by Clifford Stoneburner, Kristina Stoneburner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mary Kate Taliancich added to party Clifford Stoneburner(pty:pla), Kristina Stoneburner(pty:pla))(aty,Taliancich, Mary) Modified on 5/26/2021 to reflect filed in error and resubmitted at Document #2 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) FILED IN ERROR. RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY AT DOC 2. COMPLAINT against United Property & Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4685987) filed by Clifford Stoneburner, Kristina Stoneburner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mary Kate Taliancich added to party Clifford Stoneburner(pty:pla), Kristina Stoneburner(pty:pla))(aty,Taliancich, Mary) Modified on 5/26/2021 to reflect filed in error and resubmitted at Document #2 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co.(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, United Property & Casualty Insurance Co answer due 7/8/2021.. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/11/2021. (crt,Petrofes, T) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Christopher K Jones on behalf of United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/24/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party United Property & Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified on 6/10/2021 to create docket entry relationship (Miletello, A). (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford Stoneburner, Kristina Stoneburner. United Property & Casualty Insurance Co served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (aty,Taliancich, Mary) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Clifford Stoneburner, Kristina Stoneburner . (aty,Taliancich, Mary) Modified docket text on 5/26/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED IN ERROR. RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY AT DOC 2. COMPLAINT against United Property & Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4685987) filed by Clifford Stoneburner, Kristina Stoneburner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mary Kate Taliancich added to party Clifford Stoneburner(pty:pla), Kristina Stoneburner(pty:pla))(aty,Taliancich, Mary) Modified on 5/26/2021 to reflect filed in error and resubmitted at Document #2 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rae Dietz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard William Wolff