This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:24:09 (UTC).

Stone v. Roseboom et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Stone filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Roseboom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00675

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kiel Stone

Niles, MI 49120

Defendants

Julie Lawson

St. Joseph County Jail

St. Joseph County Public Defenders Office

Andrea Halpin

James Niedbalski

Linda Brotherson

Jeff Roseboom

Carlisle, Town of

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION for extension of time to file a fee waiver regarding #6 by plaintiff Kiel Stone; (ns) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT JUDGE regarding Magistrate Judge Order #5 by plaintiff Kiel Stone (ns) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (ns). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Indiana; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Kiel Stone (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (ns) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Notice of Appeal #6 with a docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Kiel Stone (ns) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for extension of time to file a fee waiver regarding #6 by plaintiff Kiel Stone; (ns) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT JUDGE regarding Magistrate Judge Order #5 by plaintiff Kiel Stone (ns) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (ns). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT from USDC Northern Indiana, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 3:19-cv-00781 (ndj) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • (DISREGARD)ACKNOWLEDGMENT to USDC Northern Indiana, of receipt of transfer case (ndj) Modified on 9/20/2019 (ndj). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Indiana per Order #5 (ns) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to Other District #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kiel Stone (ns) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Indiana; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Kiel Stone (ns) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Kiel Stone (ns) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Kiel Stone (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (ns) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less