This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 09:10:36 (UTC).

Stone v. New Prime, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Stone filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against New Prime, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00480

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Stone

Defendants

New Prime, Inc.

Gabriel P Guillermo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew David Minucci

Attorney at The Cottle Firm

8635 South Eastern Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Caj Boatright

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Roland Christensen

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Samantha Demuren

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Bruce Alverson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Karie N. Wilson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-22-848213-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6832396) by New Prime, Inc.. Proof of service due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by New Prime, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/2022. By Deputy Clerk: K. Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/1/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#6

(#6) ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

6 #1

Summons

#8

(#8) Defendant New Prime, Inc.'s ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by New Prime, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/8/2022.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/11/2022. By Law Clerk: J. Florey.It has come to the attention of the Court that the parties failed to file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order in accordance with United States District Court for the District of Nevada Local Rule 26-1. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of the date of this Order; provided, however, that if a joint discovery plan and scheduling order or stipulation cannot be agreed upon, either party may file a motion to stay discovery within the same 14 day period. (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant New Prime, Inc.'s ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by New Prime, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/8/2022.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Roland Christensen, Caj Boatright, and Samantha Demuren to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/5/2022. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Violation of Federal Rule 28:1446 and Attorney Action Required. ERROR: Documents missing re: #1 PETITION. Attorney Karie Wilson is advised to file the Complaint, Summons and Answer from the State Court case using the event Errata in accordance with Federal Rule 28:1446(a) and LR IC 2-2(c). Additionally, attorney advised to properly link newly filed Errata to #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/2022. By Deputy Clerk: K. Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/1/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (KF) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by New Prime, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant New Prime, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-22-848213-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6832396) by New Prime, Inc.. Proof of service due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce Alverson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karie N. Wilson