This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/25/2019 at 08:06:35 (UTC).

Stone v. Judicial Correction Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Stone filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Judicial Correction Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04325

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Little G. Stone

West Point, GA 31833

Defendant

Judicial Correction Services, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Little G. Stone re #5 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous, #6 Clerk's Judgment. (jpa) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S JUDGMENT (jpa)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (jpa) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B) and DIRECTS the Clerk to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/20/19. (jpa) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 Order, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Little G. Stone re #4 Order. (jpa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's #3 Complaint; GRANTS Plaintiff leave to amend the complaint and re-file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order; and DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this action after thirty (30) days. Plaintiff's failure to file an amended complaint within the time allotted will result in dismissal of this action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/16/19. (jpa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Little G. Stone re #2 Order. (jpa) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Little G. Stone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to submit this action to the District Judge for review of Plaintiffs Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/27/19. (jpa) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (bnp) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Little G. Stone. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Judicial Correction Services, Incorporated is a litigant