This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:12:23 (UTC).

Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC v. Agena Bioscience, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Agena Bioscience, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Dana Douglas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12947

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Ann Vial Lemmon

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC

Defendant

Agena Bioscience, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Diana Cole Surprenant

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Philip Anthony Franco

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Cangelosi

Attorney at King & Jurgens, LLC

201 St. Charles Ave., Ste 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Henry A. King

Attorney at King, Krebs & Jurgens, PLLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Scott Alan Miller

Attorney at Dillon Miller & Ahuja, LLP

5872 Owens Ave., Suite 200

Carlsbad, CA 92008

William Spencer King

Attorney at King, Krebs & Jurgens, PLLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

#14

13 #3

Proposed Pleading Exhibit

13 #2

Proposed Pleading

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

9 #5

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

9 #4

Proposed Order

9 #3

Exhibit 2

9 #2

Exhibit 1

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Receipt of Transfer Case to Southern District of California (pp) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER AND REASONS - Case transferred to Southern District of California. FURTHER ORDERED that Agena's Motion to Dismiss Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 12/19/2019.(sbs) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Agena Bioscience, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sbs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 12/18/2019. (sbs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Agena Bioscience, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Pleading Exhibit)(Miller, Scott) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **FILED IN ERROR** REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Agena Bioscience, Inc. re MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Scott) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (sbs).** (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **FILED IN ERROR** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Agena Bioscience, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Scott) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Surprenant, Diana) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Agena Bioscience, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Cangelosi, John) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/25/2019) (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #5 Notice of Submission (Civil Only)) (sbs). Modified text on 11/25/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott Alan Miller. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott A. Miller (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7941987) by Agena Bioscience, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration under oath, #3 Exhibit ECF registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Cangelosi, John) Modified text on 11/7/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Agena Bioscience, Inc. answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 10/30/2019. (sbs) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint, by Agena Bioscience, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney John A. Cangelosi added to party Agena Bioscience, Inc.(pty:dft).(Cangelosi, John) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Diana Cole Surprenant of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons served on Agena Bioscience, Inc. on October 11, 2019; answer due 11/1/2019. (Surprenant, Diana) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Agena Bioscience, Inc. (ajn) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7888040) filed by Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Diana Cole Surprenant added to party Stone Clinical Laboratories, LLC(pty:pla).(Surprenant, Diana) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (ajn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/4/2019) (ajn). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGENA BIOSCIENCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Cangelosi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Spencer King