This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2021 at 10:21:14 (UTC).

Stompingbear v. Payne et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Stompingbear filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Payne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and Beth Deere. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

Referral Judge

Beth Deere

 

Party Details

Defendants

Dexter Payne

John Rodgers

Marshall Reed

Justine Minor

Dyes

Roy Griffen

Wendy Kelley

Butcher

Clayton

Scott Ward

Jesse Jackson, III

Lewis

Raymon Naylor

Steven Mitchell

Edwards

Watson

Asa Hutchinson

Stan Wofford

Walker

Arkansas Department of Correction

49 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Mr. Stompingbear is reminded that he must file an amended complaint by 5/21/2021 setting out related claims. If he fails to do so, the Court will recommend that his claims be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/18/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to #9 Order by Happy Stompingbear. (kdr) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, Mr. Stompingbear has 30 days to file an amended complaint limited to first amendment claims that arose after 3/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/21/2021. (csf) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filing fee: $402 received, receipt number LIT081694. (bmd) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #3 motion to consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/31/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application, along with a copy of this Order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay a $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/31/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Happy Stompingbear. (llg) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint by Happy Stompingbear. (llg) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Happy Stompingbear. (ljb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter re Filing Fee from Happy Stompingbear. (ljb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Happy Stompingbear. (ljb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butcher is a litigant

Latest cases where . Clayton is a litigant

Latest cases where Arkansas Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Edwards is a litigant