This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2021 at 07:07:33 (UTC).

Stoffey v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Stoffey filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Jill L. Burkhardt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Stoffey

Defendant

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah Jane Demers

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Alan Edward Kassan

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorney

Blake Justin Russum

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

1001 Marshall Street, Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/26/2021.(jmr) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company . Identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Russum, Blake)(jmr). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Russum, Blake) (jmr). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The Court extends Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint until March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/2/2021. (jmr) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Stoffey. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served. (Demers, Sarah) (jmr). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Edward Kassan on behalf of Jennifer Stoffey (Kassan, Alan)Attorney Alan Edward Kassan added to party Jennifer Stoffey(pty:pla) QC email, incorrect attorney signed. Attorney should withdraw and refile correctly (dlg). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Jennifer Stoffey. No Parties With Financial Interest. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/26/2021.(jmr) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company . Identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Russum, Blake)(jmr). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Russum, Blake) (jmr). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The Court extends Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint until March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/2/2021. (jmr) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Russum, Blake)Attorney Blake Justin Russum added to party Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Stoffey. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served. (Demers, Sarah) (jmr). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Edward Kassan on behalf of Jennifer Stoffey (Kassan, Alan)Attorney Alan Edward Kassan added to party Jennifer Stoffey(pty:pla) QC email, incorrect attorney signed. Attorney should withdraw and refile correctly (dlg). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Jennifer Stoffey. No Parties With Financial Interest. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15295939.), filed by Jennifer Stoffey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-161-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Demers, Sarah)(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blake J Russum