This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 08:12:07 (UTC).

Stoddart et al v. Devon Energy Production Company LP

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Stoddart filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Devon Energy Production Company LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00725

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beau Stoddart

Defendant

Devon Energy Production Company LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew W Dunlap

Attorney at Fibich Leebron Copeland Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard J Burch

Attorney at Richard Burch

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3025

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin M Simpsen

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael F Lauderdale

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Devon Energy Production Company LP. (rr) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Josephson on behalf of Beau Stoddart(Individually), Beau Stoddart(on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated) (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Beau Stoddart(Individually), Beau Stoddart(on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP. Devon Energy Production Company LP waiver sent on 8/24/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin M Simpsen on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Lauderdale on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Lauderdale, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Devon Energy Production Company LP.(Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Devon Energy Production Company LP . (Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Devon Energy Production Company LP . (Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Devon Energy Production Company LP.(Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Lauderdale on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Lauderdale, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin M Simpsen on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP. Devon Energy Production Company LP waiver sent on 8/24/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Beau Stoddart(Individually), Beau Stoddart(on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Josephson on behalf of Beau Stoddart(Individually), Beau Stoddart(on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated) (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3975928. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Devon Energy Production Company LP. (rr) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Devon Energy Production Company LP filed by Beau Stoddart(Individually), Beau Stoddart(on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Devon Energy Production Company LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael F Lauderdale

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin M. Simpsen