This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:32:07 (UTC).

Stockton v. Secretary of the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Stockton filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary of the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer P. Wilson and PT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer P. Wilson

Referral Judge

PT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronald Terell Stockton

Coal Township, PA 17866

Respondents

Secretary of the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections

Superintendent of SCI-Coal Township

David G. Smith

Huntington, PA 16652

Andrew Carson

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Exhibit(s)

#27

(#27) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION to Compel filed by Ronald Terell Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#26

(#26) MOTION to Compel by Ronald Terell Stockton.(aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

25 #1

Supplement

#25

(#25) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Ronald Terell Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#24

(#24) Letter to Court from Ronald Stockton re case. (aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM ORDER - The motion for extension of time (Doc. #16 ) is DISMISSED as moot since Respondents have not yet responded to this petition. We will DENYhis motion for entry of default. (Doc. #21 ). Instead, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk serve a copy of this order and the petition (Doc. #1 ), on the District Attorney for Huntingdon County and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Respondents file a response to the petition on or before April 4, 2022. The petitioners motion for discovery, (Doc. 17), is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 4, 2022. (kjn) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Default filed by Ronald Terell Stockton.(aaa) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#16

(#23) MEMORANDUM ORDER - The motion for extension of time (Doc. #16 ) is DISMISSED as moot since Respondents have not yet responded to this petition. We will DENYhis motion for entry of default. (Doc. #21 ). Instead, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk serve a copy of this order and the petition (Doc. #1 ), on the District Attorney for Huntingdon County and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Respondents file a response to the petition on or before April 4, 2022. The petitioners motion for discovery, (Doc. 17), is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 4, 2022. (kjn) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

1 #13

Exhibit M-Unidentified Transcript Excerpt

1 #11

Exhibit K-Excerpt of a Unidentified transcript

1 #10

Exhibit J-Copy of Pennsylvania State Police Property Record

1 #9

Exhibit I-Letter to Petitioner from Christopher B. Wencker, Esquire dated 10/06

1 #7

Exhibit G-Employee Report of Incident dated 12/12/2013, 12/20/2013

1 #6

Exhibit F-Procedures from the Administrative Security Leval 5 Housing Units and

1 #4

Exhibit D-Copy of a Confirmation of a Verbal Reprimand addressed to CO1 Willins

1 #3

Exhibit C-Various Inmate Requests to Staff Member Mrs. Reifer dated from 10/20

1 #1

Exhibit A-Letter to petitioner from Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION to Compel filed by Ronald Terell Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Compel by Ronald Terell Stockton.(aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Ronald Terell Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Letter to Court from Ronald Stockton re case. (aaa) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM ORDER - The motion for extension of time (Doc. #16 ) is DISMISSED as moot since Respondents have not yet responded to this petition. We will DENYhis motion for entry of default. (Doc. #21 ). Instead, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk serve a copy of this order and the petition (Doc. #1 ), on the District Attorney for Huntingdon County and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Respondents file a response to the petition on or before April 4, 2022. The petitioners motion for discovery, (Doc. 17), is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 4, 2022. (kjn) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 MOTION for Default filed by Ronald Terell Stockton.(aaa) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Default filed by Ronald Terell Stockton.(aaa) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE to the Court filed by Ronald Terell Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(aaa) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Default filed by Ronald Terell Stockton. (aaa) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION to Compel filed by Ronald Terell Stockton. (gs) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Recusal by Ronald Terell Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(aaa) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE/OBJECTION filed by Ronald Terell Stockton. (aaa) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time by Ronald Terell Stockton.(aaa) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Ronald Stockton re: receipt of filing fee and forms. (dw) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- 1. The Clerk of Court shall SERVE a copy of the Petition (Doc. 1) and this Order on the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the District Attorney of Huntingdon County, Pennsylvania. 2. Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, Respondent shall file an Answer and Memorandum addressing the timeliness of the petition and any applicable statutory and/or equitable tolling of the statute of limitations, including those raised in the petition.3. Petitioner shall, if he so desires, shall FILE a reply brief within fourteen (14) days of receipt of the Respondents filing.4. The Clerk of Court SHALL note the address of the District of Attorney of Huntingdon County, Pennsylvania, on the front of the docket sheet in this case. All documents filed by the parties and by the court shall be served upon the Huntingdon County District Attorney, the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and the Respondent.(eo) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketReceipt of payment from RONALD TERELL STOCKTON in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 1/25/2022. Receipt number 333079658 processed by gangeli. (jjs) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333079658. Petition is now deemed FILED. (dw) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Ronald Terell Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter to petitioner from Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office dated 08/10-2020, #2 Exhibit B-Court Order signed by Judge Jennifer Wilson dated 04/30/2020 in Civil Action No. 1:16-CV-0613, #3 Exhibit C-Various Inmate Requests to Staff Member Mrs. Reifer dated from 10/20/2017 through 04/30/2019, #4 Exhibit D-Copy of a Confirmation of a Verbal Reprimand addressed to CO1 Willinsky from C.O. IV C.Wright dated 03/26/2014 with supporting documentation thereto, #5 Exhibit E-Commonwealth of PA/DOC Misconduct Appeal dated 12/17/2013, #6 Exhibit F-Procedures from the Administrative Security Leval 5 Housing Units and excerpt of a transcript, #7 Exhibit G-Employee Report of Incident dated 12/12/2013, 12/20/2013, #8 Exhibit H-DC ADM 201 Glossary of Terms "Force Continuum", #9 Exhibit I-Letter to Petitioner from Christopher B. Wencker, Esquire dated 10/06/2014, #10 Exhibit J-Copy of Pennsylvania State Police Property Record, #11 Exhibit K-Excerpt of a Unidentified transcript, #12 Exhibit L-Affidavit of Probable Cause from Trooper Timothy Guenot dated 03/06/2014)(lp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2022: #13 Exhibit M-Unidentified Transcript Excerpt, #14 Exhibit N-Correspondence from the Huntingdon County District Attorney Office to Petitioner dated 03/19/2014, Order and Notice of Intent to Dismiss PCRA Petitione from Court of Common Pleas of Huntingdon County dated 10/23/2020 signed by Judge Zanic,) (lp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2022: #15 COPY OF ENVELOPE) (lp). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant