This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2019 at 07:15:33 (UTC).

STOCKLAND v. MONSANTO COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 STOCKLAND filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MONSANTO COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and HOPE T CANNON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03321

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

HOPE T CANNON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilbur Stockland

Defendant

MONSANTO COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY MICHAEL MORGAN

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN PA - ORLANDO FL

20 N Orange Ave, Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Email request

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 159) re MDL 2741 to the Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Email request) (alb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILBUR STOCKLAND. MONSANTO COMPANY served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (MORGAN, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Amended Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (alb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Amended Proposed Summons by WILBUR STOCKLAND re #3 Summons Issued (MORGAN, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (alb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4603183.), filed by Wilbur Stockland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (MORGAN, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • (#8) Interdistrict Transfer to the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA SAN FRANCISCO DIVISION located at Phillip Burton Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco, CA. 94102, re MDL 2741. (alb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 159) re MDL 2741 to the Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Email request) (alb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILBUR STOCKLAND. MONSANTO COMPANY served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (MORGAN, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (alb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Amended Proposed Summons by WILBUR STOCKLAND re #3 Summons Issued (MORGAN, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (alb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • (#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4603183.), filed by Wilbur Stockland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (MORGAN, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less