This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 09:32:08 (UTC).

Stites v. AmerAssist A/R Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Stites filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against AmerAssist A/R Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00766

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Stites

Defendant

AmerAssist A/R Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J. Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd

9760 S Roberts Roadste 1

Palos Hills, IL 60465-1629

Mary E. Philipps

9760 S. Roberts Roadsuite One

Palos Hills, IL 60465

James Crump

Attorney at Callahan Law Firm, LLC

222 W. Gregory Blvd.Ste 210

Kansas City, MO 64114

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of settlement by Amanda Stites (Philipps, David) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Amanda Stites. AmerAssist A/R Solutions, Inc. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Philipps, David) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

5 #1

MAP General Order

5 #5

Main Document

3 #2

Certificate of Good Standing of Mary E. Philipps

3 #1

Affidavit of Movant Mary E. Philipps

3 #3

Main Document

2 #2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Affidavit of Movant David J. Philipps

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER STAYING CASE. In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement #7 , this case is stayed until February 14, 2022. On or before February 14, 2022, the parties shall file either a notice of dismissal or a joint status report. Signed on November 24, 2021, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of settlement by Amanda Stites (Philipps, David) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Amanda Stites. AmerAssist A/R Solutions, Inc. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Philipps, David) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerAssist A/R Solutions, Inc. (Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 and #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps for Amanda Stites allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to allow Mary E. Philipps to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7637287) filed by James Crump on behalf of Amanda Stites. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Movant Mary E. Philipps, #2 Certificate of Good Standing of Mary E. Philipps)(Crump, James) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to allow David J. Philipps to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7637276) filed by James Crump on behalf of Amanda Stites. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Movant David J. Philipps, #2 Exhibit A)(Crump, James) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AmerAssist A/R Solutions, Inc. filed by James Crump on behalf of Amanda Stites. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7637230. Service due by 1/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crump, James) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmerAssist A/R Solutions is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Crump

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary E. Philipps

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Philipps