This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:01:54 (UTC).

Stipek v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Stipek filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Rodgers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05116

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Rodgers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Stipek

Defendant

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad L Hatfield

Attorney at Hatfield Law PLLC

8131 W Klamath Court, Suite D

Kennewick, WA 99336

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Michael Durkin

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - SPO

920 W Riverside Suite 300, P O Box 1494

Spokane, WA 99210-1494

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 8/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPayment for Civil Case ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3538534).. (Hatfield, Chad) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Stipek re Andrew M Saul. (Hatfield, Chad) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 8/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney)(AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 7/27/2020. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Sarah Stipek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less