This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:35:36 (UTC).

Stinner v. Southern Energy Homes, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Stinner filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Southern Energy Homes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00837

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda J. Stinner

Defendants

Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc.

American Mobile Home Transport, LLC

Southern Energy Homes, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Helen Virginia Kramer

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF H. VIRGINIA KRAMER, PLLC

P. O. Box 903, 106 South Archusa Ave.

Quitman, MS 39355

Paul Manion Anderson

Attorney at MCHARD, MCHARD, ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

140 Mayfair Road, Suite 1500

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Samuel S. McHard

Attorney at MCHARD, MCHARD, ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

140 Mayfair Road, Suite 1500

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Moran Young

Attorney at PAGE, MANNINO, PERESICH & MCDERMOTT, PLLC - Biloxi

759 Vieux Marche' Mall, P. O. Drawer 289 (39533)

Biloxi, MS 39530

Matthew M. Williams

Attorney at GALLOWAY, JOHNSON, TOMPKINS, BURR & SMITH - Gulfport

2510 14Th Street, Suite 910

Gulfport, MS 39501

M. James Weems

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL - Jackson

P.O. Box 1084, 4400 Old Canton Road, Suite 400 (39211)

Jackson, MS 39215

James L. Quinn

Attorney at JAMES L. QUINN, ATTORNEY

P. O. Box 271

Hattiesburg, MS 39403-0271

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Brewer, #2 Exhibit A-1 BDRA, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Gerald Mims, #4 Exhibit B-1 - Acknowledgment and Acceptance, #5 Exhibit C- Amended Complaint)(Quinn, James). Added MOTION to Stay Proceedings on 12/18/2019 (VM). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

8 #3

Exhibit B- Declaration of Gerald Mims

8 #2

Exhibit A-1 BDRA

8 #5

Exhibit C- Amended Complaint

8 #4

Exhibit B-1 - Acknowledgment and Acceptance

8 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of David Brewer

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Brenda J. Stinner (Anderson, Paul) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for January 8, 2020 is hereby stayed. In the event that the Motion to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and Stay is denied, counsel shall contact the Court within ten (10) days of the filing of such order to schedule a telephonic case management conference herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/30/2019 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#13

(#13) Joinder in Document by Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Williams, Matthew) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit "1" Answer and Defenses of American Mobile Home Transport, LLC

#10

(#10) MOTION Supplement Notice of Removal by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Answer and Defenses of American Mobile Home Transport, LLC)(Weems, M.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#12

(#12) Response to Order re TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to supplement state court record, as attached to notice of removal. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/26/2019. (ACF) filed by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC (Weems, M.) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#11

(#11) Joinder in Document by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Weems, M.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay , filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Quinn, James) MOTION to Stay Proceedings added on 12/18/2019 (VM). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Quinn, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Southern Energy Homes, Inc..(Quinn, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Acknowledgment and Acceptance

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment and Acceptance)(Williams, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Response is due on or before 1/14/2020.NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 1/7/2020 (CGC) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Brenda J. Stinner (Anderson, Paul) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for January 8, 2020 is hereby stayed. In the event that the Motion to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and Stay is denied, counsel shall contact the Court within ten (10) days of the filing of such order to schedule a telephonic case management conference herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/30/2019 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joinder in Document by Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Williams, Matthew) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Response to Order re TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to supplement state court record, as attached to notice of removal. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/26/2019. (ACF) filed by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC (Weems, M.) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to supplement state court record, as attached to notice of removal. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/26/2019. (ACF) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joinder in Document by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC to #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Weems, M.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION Supplement Notice of Removal by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Answer and Defenses of American Mobile Home Transport, LLC)(Weems, M.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : This document requests multiple motion reliefs. Each requested relief should be selected from the list of motion events. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (VM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay , filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Quinn, James) MOTION to Stay Proceedings added on 12/18/2019 (VM). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Compel Mediation/Arbitration and For Stay by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Brewer, #2 Exhibit A-1 BDRA, #3 Exhibit B- Declaration of Gerald Mims, #4 Exhibit B-1 - Acknowledgment and Acceptance, #5 Exhibit C- Amended Complaint)(Quinn, James). Added MOTION to Stay Proceedings on 12/18/2019 (VM). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Quinn, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Southern Energy Homes, Inc..(Quinn, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment and Acceptance)(Williams, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Moran Young on behalf of Magnolia Estates of Pearl, Inc. (Young, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Joinder in Document by American Mobile Home Transport, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. (Weems, M.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Energy Homes, Inc. from County Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, case number CA19-1102(H). (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4142736) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - County Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kathy Hayes, #4 Exhibit C-1 - Notice from AG, #5 Exhibit C-2 - Complaint Form, #6 Exhibit C-3 - Bill of Sale, #7 Exhibit C-4 - Purchase Agreement, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.