This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:51:40 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC v. Somfy SA et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Stingray IP Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Somfy SA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC

Defendants

Somfy SA

Somfy Activits SA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Hunter Scott Palmer

Marcus Benavides

Terry Afif Saad

Jack Wesley Hill

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Summons(es)

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Somfy Activits SA, Somfy SA. Somfy Activits SA waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; Somfy SA waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Somfy Activits SA, Somfy SA (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Somfy Activits SA, Somfy SA, filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Scott Palmer on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Palmer, Hunter) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Somfy Activits SA, Somfy SA. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Somfy Activits SA, Somfy SA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8434691.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less