This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2023 at 08:19:39 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions LLC v. Snap One Holdings Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Stingray IP Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Snap One Holdings Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Stingray IP Solutions LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Snap One Holdings Corp.

Snap One, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Terry Afif Saad

Brandon V. Zuniga

Jack Wesley Hill

Mark Douglass

Marcus Benavides

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David Brandon Conrad

Neil J McNabnay

Philip Gregory Brown

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Snap One Holdings Corp. for Snap One, LLC, Snap One, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Stingray IP Solutions LLC by Snap One, LLC, Snap One Holdings Corp..(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Stingray IP Solutions LLC of Compliance regarding P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 (Infringement Contentions) (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Douglass on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Douglass, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip Gregory Brown on behalf of Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC (Brown, Philip) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC (Conrad, David) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

4 #1

Summons(es)

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/01/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Snap One Holdings Corp. for Snap One, LLC, Snap One, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Stingray IP Solutions LLC by Snap One, LLC, Snap One Holdings Corp..(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE by Stingray IP Solutions LLC of Compliance regarding P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 (Infringement Contentions) (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Douglass on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Douglass, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip Gregory Brown on behalf of Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC (Brown, Philip) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC (Conrad, David) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Snap One, LLC to 3/1/2023; Snap One Holdings Corp. to 3/1/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Snap One Holdings Corp., Snap One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9290989.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less