2:21-CV-00043
02/08/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Rodney Gilstrap
Stingray IP Solutions, LLC
Signify N.V.
Jack Wesley Hill
Jeffrey Ray Bragalone
Marcus Benavides
Terry Afif Saad
Hunter Scott Palmer
Brady Randall Cox
Civil Cover Sheet
Text of Proposed Order
DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Signify N.V. to 5/31/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Response date 5/31/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/2/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Signify N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Brady) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Signify N.V. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Scott Palmer on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Palmer, Hunter) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Signify N.V.. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against Signify N.V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8238847.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
[-] Read Less