This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 11:09:18 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC v. Signify N.V.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Stingray IP Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Signify N. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC

Defendant

Signify N.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcus Benavides

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Terry Afif Saad

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Hunter Scott Palmer

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

Brady Randall Cox

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP - Dallas

2828 N. Harwood Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Signify N.V. to 5/31/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Response date 5/31/2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/2/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Signify N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Brady) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Signify N.V. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Scott Palmer on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Palmer, Hunter) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Signify N.V.. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Signify N.V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8238847.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stingray IP Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry Afif Saad