This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2021 at 11:21:01 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On January 29, 2021, Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (“Stingray”), represented by Jeffrey R. Bragalone, Hunter Scott Palmer, Marcus Benavides and Terry Afif Saad of Brangalone Conroy PC and Jack Wesley Hill from Ward, Smith, and Hill PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (“SEC”) and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (“SEA”) (collectively, “Samsung”), represented by Melissa Richards Smith of Gillam & Smith, LLP, seeking treble damages with prejudgment and post judgment interest for alleged infringement of one or more claims of US Patents relating to wireless communication system and other technologies owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

 

In their complaint, Stingray alleges that Samsung has and continues to infringe, directly or indirectly, certain claims under U.S. Patent No. 6,958,986 (the “’986 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 6,961,310 (the “’310 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 6,980,537 (the “’537 patent”), and U.S. Patent No. 7,027,426 (the “’426 patent”) owned by them (collectively “Asserted Patents”).

 

The Plaintiff notes that “the Asserted Patents cover various aspects of communication, routing, and organizing network nodes within wireless communications networks. The methods and apparatuses described in each of the Asserted Patents apply to mobile ad hoc networks—dynamic wireless networks without any routing structure, such as the networks created between Defendants’ IoT and smart home devices.”

 

The Plaintiff further believes upon information that “a significant portion of the operating revenue of Defendants is derived from the manufacture and sale of IoT and smart home devices” and that “Samsung’s IoT and smart home devices use ZigBee and Z-Wave protocols to enable communication between Samsung’s devices.” The Plaintiff further alleges that “The Asserted Patents cover wireless communication methods that are incorporated into ZigBee and Z-Wave protocols and the products that utilize them, such as Samsung’s IoT and smart home devices, their components, and processes related to the same.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out four reliefs for claim, one for the infringement of each of its Patents ‘986, ‘310, ‘537 and ‘426 respectively wherein the Plaintiff alleged that Samsung designs, develops, manufactures, assembles, and markets products that utilise one or more of the claims of each of the Patents listed above and by making, offering for sale, selling, and/or importing the products, their components, and/or products containing the same that incorporate the fundamental technologies covered by the Asserted Patents, Samsung infringes one or more of the claims of all the Patents listed above. As a result of the alleged infringing conduct of Samsung, Stingray alleges it has been damaged and shall be compensated in an amount that adequately compensates Stingray for Samsung’s infringements, which, by law, cannot be less than a reasonable royalty, together with interest and costs as fixed by the Court under 35 U.S.C. § 284.

 

In their prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the court to find that Defendants have infringed the Asserted Patents directly and/or indirectly by way of inducing infringement of such patents and to enter a judgement to account for damages sustained by Plaintiff as a result of the alleged acts of infringement by Defendants, and to require the Defendants to pay for damages and royalties along with prejudgment and post judgment interest. Plaintiff also requested the court to find this as an exceptional case so as to require defendants to pay the cost of action along with attorneys fees as well.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC

Defendants

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Terry Afif Saad

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Hunter Scott Palmer

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcus Benavides

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8224086.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Scott Palmer on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Palmer, Hunter) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (klc, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (klc, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 5/23/2021; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to 5/23/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Scott Palmer on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Palmer, Hunter) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (klc, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (klc, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8224086.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stingray IP Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith