This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2022 at 09:36:54 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions LLC v. Resideo Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 Stingray IP Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Resideo Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00420

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions LLC

Defendants

Resideo Technologies, Inc.

Ademco Inc.

Consolidated Defendants

Johnson Controls International plc,

Johnson Control, Inc.

Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC

ADT Inc.

ADT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Brandon V. Zuniga

Jack Wesley Hill

Marcus Benavides

Paul Campbell Stevenson

Terry Afif Saad

Defendant Attorney

Brady Randall Cox

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Theresa A. Roozen

Michael Eric Zeliger

Steven Tepera

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa A. Roozen on behalf of ADT Inc., ADT LLC (Roozen, Theresa) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against ADT Inc., ADT LLC, filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#16

(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Eric Zeliger on behalf of ADT Inc., ADT LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9269528. (Zeliger, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/10/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#13

(#13) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00420. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#12

(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ademco Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc..( Cox, Brady) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Resideo Technologies, Inc. served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Ademco Inc. served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

4 #1

Summons(es) Ademco Inc.

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa A. Roozen on behalf of ADT Inc., ADT LLC (Roozen, Theresa) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against ADT Inc., ADT LLC, filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Eric Zeliger on behalf of ADT Inc., ADT LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9269528. (Zeliger, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/10/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00420. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ademco Inc. to 12/22/2022; Resideo Technologies, Inc. to 12/22/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ademco Inc., Resideo Technologies, Inc..( Cox, Brady) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Resideo Technologies, Inc. served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Ademco Inc. served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Ademco Inc. Corporation Service Company dba CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Corporation Service Company dba CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Ademco Inc.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9198560.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less