This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2021 at 07:58:53 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC v. Legrand et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Stingray IP Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Legrand. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00202

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC

Defendants

Legrand SNC

Legrand France

Bticino SPA

Legrand

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Hunter Scott Palmer

Marcus Benavides

Terry Afif Saad

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine K. Vidal

Ahtoosa Dale

Jeanifer Parsigian

Juan Yaquian

Matthew Hopkins

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#5

4 #3

Summons(es) LEGRAND

4 #2

Summons(es) LEGRAND SNC

4 #1

Summons(es) LEGRAND FRANCE

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Juan Yaquian on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8495693. (Yaquian, Juan) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Hopkins on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8495679. (Hopkins, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeanifer Parsigian on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8495664. (Parsigian, Jeanifer) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bticino SPA, Legrand France, Legrand, Legrand SNC. Bticino SPA waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; Legrand France waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; Legrand waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; Legrand SNC waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ahtoosa Dale on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC (Dale, Ahtoosa) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine K. Vidal on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC (Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Scott Palmer on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Palmer, Hunter) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Bticino SPA served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Legrand SNC served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Legrand France served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Legrand served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) LEGRAND FRANCE, #2 Summons(es) LEGRAND SNC, #3 Summons(es) LEGRAND)(nkl, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8441773.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less