This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2021 at 07:58:37 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC v. Legrand et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Stingray IP Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Legrand. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC

Defendants

Legrand SNC

Legrand France

Bticino SPA

Legrand

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Hunter Scott Palmer

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcus Benavides

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Terry Afif Saad

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine K. Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Menlo Park

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Ahtoosa Dale

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2121 N Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Jeanifer Parsigian

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - San Francisco

101 California Street, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94111-5894

Juan Yaquian

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Houston

800 Capitol St., 24Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Matthew Hopkins

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - DC

1901 L Street, N.W.Washington

Washington, DC 20036-3506

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#5

4 #3

Summons(es)

4 #2

Summons(es)

4 #1

Summons(es)

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Juan Yaquian on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8495650. (Yaquian, Juan) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Hopkins on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8495610. (Hopkins, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeanifer Parsigian on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8495522. (Parsigian, Jeanifer) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bticino SPA, Legrand France, Legrand, Legrand SNC. Bticino SPA waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; Legrand France waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; Legrand waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; Legrand SNC waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ahtoosa Dale on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC (Dale, Ahtoosa) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine K. Vidal on behalf of Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC (Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Scott Palmer on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Palmer, Hunter) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Bticino SPA served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Legrand SNC served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Legrand France served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. Legrand served on 6/8/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bticino SPA, Legrand, Legrand France, Legrand SNC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8441718.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LeGrand is a litigant

Latest cases where Stingray IP Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry Afif Saad