This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2022 at 08:06:29 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions LLC v. Johnson Controls International plc, et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Stingray IP Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Johnson Controls International plc,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions LLC

Defendants

Johnson Controls International plc,

Johnson Control, Inc.

Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marcus Benavides

Paul Campbell Stevenson

Terry Afif Saad

Brandon V. Zuniga

Jack Wesley Hill

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Summons(es)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Johnson Control, Inc. served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Johnson Controls International plc, waiver sent on 10/18/2022, answer due 1/16/2023. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

13 #13

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AND STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/20/2022. (klc, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AND STIPULATION by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Johnson Controls International plc, waiver sent on 10/18/2022, answer due 1/16/2023. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Johnson Control, Inc. served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC, Johnson Control, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9169724.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less