This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:51:09 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Stingray IP Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions, LLC

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

Immedia Semiconductor LLC

Ring LLC

eero LLC

Amazon.com Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenuesuite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Hunter Scott Palmer

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenuesuite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcus Benavides

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenuesuite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Terry Afif Saad

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenuesuite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Defendant Attorneys

J David Hadden

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Mountain View

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Geoffrey Robert Miller

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - New York

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010

Min Wu

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ravi R Ranganath

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Saina Shamilov

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Mountain View

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

5 #4

Summons(es)

5 #3

Summons(es)

5 #2

Summons(es)

5 #1

Summons(es)

4 #4

Summons(es) RING LLC

4 #2

Summons(es) EERO LLC

4 #1

Summons(es) AMAZON.COM, INC.

#4

#2

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Immedia Semiconductor LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Immedia Semiconductor LLC. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ring LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Ring LLC. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eero LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc., for eero LLC. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc., for Amazon.com Services LLC. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Robert Miller on behalf of All Defendants (Miller, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravi R Ranganath on behalf of All Defendants (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saina Shamilov on behalf of All Defendants (Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J David Hadden on behalf of All Defendants (Hadden, J) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, [Answer of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLC to Complaint for Patent Infringement] by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Hadden, J) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions, LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Immedia Semiconductor LLC, Ring LLC, eero LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. TO CORRECT NAME Document # 4, Summons. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com Services LLC c/o CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, Amazon.com, Inc. c/o CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, Immedia Semiconductor LLC c/o CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, Ring LLC c/o CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, eero LLC c/o CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) AMAZON.COM, INC., #2 Summons(es) EERO LLC, #3 Summons(es) IMMEDIA SEMICONDUCTOR LLC, #4 Summons(es) RING LLC)(nkl, ) Modified on 6/1/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Immedia Semiconductor LLC, Ring LLC, eero LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8434601.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where eero LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Stingray IP Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant