This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2022 at 09:37:11 (UTC).

Stingray IP Solutions LLC v. ADT Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 Stingray IP Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ADT Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stingray IP Solutions LLC

Defendants

ADT Inc.

ADT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Jack Wesley Hill

Terry Afif Saad

Brandon V. Zuniga

Paul Campbell Stevenson

Marcus Benavides

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Tepera

Theresa A. Roozen

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Summons(es) ADT LLC

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT Inc. served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#12

(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADT Inc., ADT LLC.( Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADT Inc., ADT LLC (Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#14

(#14) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00420. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Theresa A. Roozen on behalf of ADT Inc., ADT LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9269006. (Roozen, Theresa) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00420. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ADT LLC to 12/22/2022; ADT Inc. to 12/22/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADT Inc., ADT LLC (Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADT Inc., ADT LLC.( Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT Inc. served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to ADT Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, ADT LLC c/o C T Corporation System. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) ADT LLC)(nkl, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9199278.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less