2:22-CV-00421
10/26/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Roy S. Payne
Rodney Gilstrap
Stingray IP Solutions LLC
ADT Inc.
ADT LLC
Jeffrey Ray Bragalone
Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
901 Main Street, Suite 3800
Dallas, TX 75202
Jack Wesley Hill
Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
1507 Bill Owens Parkway
Longview, TX 75604
Terry Afif Saad
Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
901 Main Street, Suite 3800
Dallas, TX 75202
Brandon V. Zuniga
Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
901 Main Street, Suite 3800
Dallas, TX 75205
Paul Campbell Stevenson
Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
901 Main Street, Suite 3800
Dallas, TX 75202
Marcus Benavides
Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
901 Main Street, Suite 3800
Dallas, TX 75202
Steven Tepera
Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
401 Congress, Suite 1700
Austin, TX 78701
Theresa A. Roozen
Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP - Washington
1200 Seventeenth Street, Nw
Washington, DC 20036
Main Document
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
Main Document
Summons(es) ADT LLC
(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT Inc. served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADT Inc., ADT LLC.( Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADT Inc., ADT LLC (Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
(#14) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00420. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)
Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Theresa A. Roozen on behalf of ADT Inc., ADT LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9269006. (Roozen, Theresa) (Entered: 12/14/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00420. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ADT LLC to 12/22/2022; ADT Inc. to 12/22/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADT Inc., ADT LLC (Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADT Inc., ADT LLC.( Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT Inc. served on 11/4/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Campbell Stevenson on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Stevenson, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. ADT LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to ADT Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, ADT LLC c/o C T Corporation System. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) ADT LLC)(nkl, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9199278.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2022)
[-] Read Less