This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 07:36:10 (UTC).

Stines et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Stines filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04805

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James R Stines

Jo Linda Stines

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J Diamond

Attorney at Goldberg & Osborne - Tucson

698 E Wetmore Rd., Ste. 200

Tucson, AZ 85705

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17198841 filed by James R Stines, Jo Linda Stines. (Diamond, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17198841. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4805-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/25/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by James R Stines, Jo Linda Stines. (Diamond, David) (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in Northern District of California. New Case Number: 3:19-cv-5327. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/25/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17198841. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4805-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by James R Stines, Jo Linda Stines. (Diamond, David) (MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17198841 filed by James R Stines, Jo Linda Stines. (Diamond, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.