This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2021 at 09:39:57 (UTC).

STIGALL, JR. v. SAUL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 STIGALL, JR filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SAUL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARRY W. STIGALL JR.

LARRY W. STIGALL, JR.

Defendant

ANDREW M. SAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirsten Elaine Wold

Attorney at HANKEY LAW OFFICE

434 E. New York St

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

600 West Madison Street, 6Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

Julian Clifford Wierenga

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File the electronic certified administrative record and answer to Plaintiff's Complaint to 5/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/15/2021. (SWM) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Filing No. #3 , is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/26/2021. Copy Mailed. (CKM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File the electronic certified administrative record and answer to Plaintiff's Complaint to 5/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/15/2021. (SWM) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to May 21, 2021 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brechtelsbauer, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Brechtelsbauer, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Filing No. #3 , is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/26/2021. Copy Mailed. (CKM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff LARRY W. STIGALL JR.. (Wold, Kirsten) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Elaine Wold on behalf of Plaintiff LARRY W. STIGALL JR.. (Wold, Kirsten) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by LARRY W. STIGALL JR.. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wold, Kirsten) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Clifford Wierenga