This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:25 (UTC).

Stiebel et al v. Robinson et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Stiebel filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Robinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McDonald and Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03395

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter A Stiebel

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendants

Harold Robinson

M D Manley

Grady Morgan

Talbotton Police Department

Mike Cordero

Justin Johnson

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/27/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The Clerk is directed to update the docket to reflect Chief Justin Johnson as a defendant in lieu of Talbotton Police Department. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Court's Interrogatories)(ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #1

Complaint Continued

1 #2

Envelope

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/2/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

11 #1

Court's Interrogatories

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mike Cordero, M D Manley, Grady Morgan, Harold Robinson, Talbotton Police Department, filed by Peter A Stiebel. Service due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Complaint Continued, #2 Envelope)(abuc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Peter A Stiebel 1309 Greenville County Detention Center 20 McGee Street Greenville, SC 29601 with special interrogatories (kric, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/27/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The Clerk is directed to update the docket to reflect Chief Justin Johnson as a defendant in lieu of Talbotton Police Department. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Court's Interrogatories)(ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Peter A Stiebel 1309 Greenville County Detention Center 20 McGee Street Greenville, SC 29601 with blank summons and blank USM285 forms as directed. (kric, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/2/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#3) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (abuc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Peter A Stiebel. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(abuc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mike Cordero, M D Manley, Grady Morgan, Harold Robinson, Talbotton Police Department, filed by Peter A Stiebel. Service due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Complaint Continued, #2 Envelope)(abuc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less