This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2020 at 07:46:06 (UTC).

STI Holdings, Inc. et al v. Hyundai Translead, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 STI Holdings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hyundai Translead, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04180

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stoughton Trailers, LLC

STI Holdings, Inc.

Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC

Defendant

Hyundai Translead, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brianna Jane Siebken

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

444 W Lake Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60606

Jonathan H. Margolies

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

790 N. Water Street, Suite 2500

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Katherine W Schill

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

790 North Water Street, Suite 2500

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Shane Allen Brunner

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

1 S. Pinckney Street, Suite 700

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant Attorney

Peter John Shakula, II

Attorney at Wood Phillips

500 W. Madison St, Suite 1130

Chicago, IL 60661-2562

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A-C

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Motion by Peter John Shakula, II for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/15/2020 at 11:00 AM. (Shakula, Peter) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by Defendant Hyundai Translead, Inc. for extension of time Agreed (Shakula, Peter) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hyundai Translead, Inc. by Peter John Shakula, II (Shakula, Peter) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time #12 is granted. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise plead on or before 9/11/20. Additionally, the parties' shall submit a joint status report on or before 9/11/20. The 8/13/20 notice of motion date is hereby stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan H. Margolies for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/13/2020 at 11:00 AM. (Margolies, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Plaintiffs STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC for extension of time to Respond to Complaint and Submit Joint Status Report (Margolies, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC as to Hyundai Translead, Inc. on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Brunner, Shane) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC by Katherine W Schill (Schill, Katherine) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 8/17/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (lma, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC by Shane Allen Brunner (Brunner, Shane) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hyundai Translead, Inc. (gw, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC by Brianna Jane Siebken (Siebken, Brianna) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC (Margolies, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC by Jonathan H. Margolies (Margolies, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Margolies, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by STI Holdings, Inc., Stoughton Parts Sales, LLC, Stoughton Trailers, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17220376. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Margolies, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDIA TRANSLEAD is a litigant

Latest cases where STOUGHTON TRAILERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brianna Jane Siebken

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine W Schill