This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 08:23:50 (UTC).

Stewart v. United Parcel Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Stewart filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against United Parcel Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gwynne E. Birzer and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02461

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin R Stewart

Kevin R. Stewart

Defendant

United Parcel Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcos A. Barbosa

Attorney at The Law Offices of Marcos A. Barbosa, LLC

4707 Roe Parkway, Suite 100

Roeland Park, KS 66205

Defendant Attorneys

Shelley I. Ericsson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - KC

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Anne L. Hershewe

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - KC

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant United Parcel Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Hershewe, Anne) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/28/2020 for Defendant United Parcel Services, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/14/2020. (ca) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Kevin R. Stewart upon United Parcel Services, Inc. served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020 (Barbosa, Marcos) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kevin R Stewart. (Barbosa, Marcos) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5261383.), filed by Kevin R Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barbosa, Marcos) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. is granted an extension of time, up to and including December 2, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant United Parcel Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Hershewe, Anne) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/28/2020 for Defendant United Parcel Services, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/14/2020. (ca) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Kevin R. Stewart upon United Parcel Services, Inc. served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020 (Barbosa, Marcos) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT EVENT USED. SEE DE 4 FOR CORRECT FILING*** NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kevin R. Stewart of Summons to United Parcel Service, Inc. (Barbosa, Marcos) Modified on 10/14/2020 (ca). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to United Parcel Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kevin R Stewart. (Barbosa, Marcos) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5261383.), filed by Kevin R Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barbosa, Marcos) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less