This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 07:27:45 (UTC).

Stewart v. The Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Stewart filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against The Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05437

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Stewart

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline LLC,

The Abbott Laboratories

Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc.

Carnick Laboratories, Inc.

Dart Industries Inc.

Eli Lilly and Company

Kremers-Urban Co.

Lannett Co., Inc

McNeilab, Inc.

SmithKline Beecham Corp.

Merck & Co., Inc.

Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Rowell Laboratories, Inc.

E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc.

The Upjohn Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A London

Attorney at Douglas & London

59 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel J. Abate, Jr.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Kevin C Tierney

Attorney at Tierney Law Office

100 South Broad Street, 1125 Land Title Building

Philadelphia, PA 19110

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Tierney on behalf of Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Tierney on behalf of Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketORDER Counsel are directed to confer and, by December 7, 2021, shall jointly advise the Court, via ECF, whether they desire an initial conference before the Court in this DES case or prefer to submit a joint proposed schedule for discovery and other pretrial matters. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/23/2021. (LK) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 4653160197 (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Karen Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rowell Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc. is a litigant