This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 09:06:27 (UTC).

Stewart v. Pros Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Stewart filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Pros Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard A. Friedman and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-12434

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bernard A. Friedman

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travis J. Stewart

Defendant

Pros Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joey S. Niskar

Attorney at The Niskar Law Firm, PLLC

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Pros Services, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Niskar, Joey) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Pros Services, Inc.* (LGra) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Travis J. Stewart against Pros Services, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8027333 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Niskar, Joey) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Pros Services, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Niskar, Joey) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Pros Services, Inc.* (LGra) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Travis J. Stewart against Pros Services, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8027333 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Niskar, Joey) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less