This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:49:23 (UTC).

Stewart v. Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Stewart filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel B. Toomey and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00796

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randall Stewart

Defendant

Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shands M. Wulbern

Attorney at The Law Office of Shands M. Wulbern, PA

Suite 5, 3063 Hartley Road

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Defendant Attorneys

Sami Achem

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

4686 Sunbeam Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Victoria Merritt

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.

4686 Sunbeam Road

Jacksonville, FL 32257

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Court Docket

13 #1

Mediation Report Form

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/15/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Corporate Parent Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc., Other Affiliate Randall Stewart, Other Affiliate Sami R. Achem, Jr., Esq., Other Affiliate Victoria M. Merritt for Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc... (Achem, Sami) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Randall Stewart. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Achem, Sami) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Randall Stewart. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

6 #2

Consent Letter and Form

6 #1

Case Management Report Form

#6

(#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) MOTION to Amend #4 Answer to Complaint by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RH)(originally filed in State Court) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 7/21/2020 (RH). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (originally filed in State Court) (RH) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Randall Stewart. (originally filed in State Court)(RH) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#14) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (RH) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/15/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A., Corporate Parent Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc., Other Affiliate Randall Stewart, Other Affiliate Sami R. Achem, Jr., Esq., Other Affiliate Victoria M. Merritt for Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc... (Achem, Sami) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Randall Stewart. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Achem, Sami) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Randall Stewart. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Defendant's Unopposed and Agreed Upon Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant filing a proper federal court motion, if appropriate, in accordance with all applicable rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/22/2020. (RLS) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Amend #4 Answer to Complaint by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RH)(originally filed in State Court) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 7/21/2020 (RH). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (originally filed in State Court) (RH) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Randall Stewart. (originally filed in State Court)(RH) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-796-J-34JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cicuit Court of The Fourth Judicial Circuit In and For Duval County, Florida, case number 3:20-CA-00796 filed in State Court on 7/16/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17070978 filed by Ohio Mulch Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Achem, Sami) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less