This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 10:08:49 (UTC).

Stewart v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Stewart filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stefan R. Underhill, Sarah A. L. Merriam and Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01429

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sarah A. L. Merriam

Presiding Judges

Stefan R. Underhill

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Stewart

Bridgeport, CT 06604

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Julia C. Walker

Attorney at Social Security Administration

601 E. 12Th Street, Ste 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#18

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

10 #1

Consent Form

#10

(#10) REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER. The self-represented plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed in this matter without the payment of fees and costs (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff's motion has been filed using a "Short Form" that is generally not used in this District for cases involving the appeal of a Social Security disability determination. If plaintiff wishes to proceed in this matter without paying the applicable fees and costs, he must re-file his motion using the form motion utilized in this District for cases involving the appeal of a Social Security disability determination. A copy of that form motion is attached to this Order.Plaintiff shall re-file his motion on or before October 16, 2020, or this matter may be dismissed.It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/24/2020. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #1

ADDED PDF - Envelope

#1

(#8) ORDER. So that the Court may determine whether plaintiff has properly exhausted his administrative remedies, on or before October 16, 2020, plaintiff shall file a copy of the Appeals Council decision that was allegedly issued on September 14, 2020. See Doc. #1 at 2. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/24/2020. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (ECF No. #19 ) is hereby GRANTED to January 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/20/2020. (Mata, E.) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time until January 22, 2021for Filing of the Administrative Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walker, Julia) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE Providing Email Address by Dennis Stewart re #12 Consent to Electronic Notice, #13 MOTION for by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing Order (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#17) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Alvin W. Thompson for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2020.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing including #13 MOTION for by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing Order Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/16/2020.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER. The self-represented plaintiff has filed a #12 Consent to Electronic Notice and a #13 Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Although plaintiff has largely completed each of these forms, he has failed to provide an email address in either form. See Doc. #12 at 1; Doc. #13 at 1. In order to receive electronic notice and to participate in electronic filing, plaintiff must provide the Court with a valid email address. Accordingly, on or before October 23, 2020, plaintiff shall re-file both the Consent to Electronic Notice form and the Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing form, including in each a valid email address. Failure to timely provide this information will result in the denial of both motions. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/6/2020. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER. Plaintiff has filed two motions (using different forms) seeking to proceed without the payment of fees and costs, each of which includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 , Doc. #11 . In each of those motions, plaintiff has sworn that he has no income and no assets. See generally id. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 , Doc. #11 ) are GRANTED. The Court also reminds plaintiff that pursuant to the Court's September 24, 2020, Order, he is to file a copy of the Appeals Council decision on or before October 16, 2020. See Doc. #8. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/6/2020. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Dennis Stewart. (Email Address was not listed on the form) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent to Electronic Notice by Dennis Stewart (Email Address was not listed on the form) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Stewart. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia C. Walker on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Walker, Julia) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER. So that the Court may determine whether plaintiff has properly exhausted his administrative remedies, on or before October 16, 2020, plaintiff shall file a copy of the Appeals Council decision that was allegedly issued on September 14, 2020. See Doc. #1 at 2. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/24/2020. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. The self-represented plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed in this matter without the payment of fees and costs (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff's motion has been filed using a "Short Form" that is generally not used in this District for cases involving the appeal of a Social Security disability determination. If plaintiff wishes to proceed in this matter without paying the applicable fees and costs, he must re-file his motion using the form motion utilized in this District for cases involving the appeal of a Social Security disability determination. A copy of that form motion is attached to this Order.Plaintiff shall re-file his motion on or before October 16, 2020, or this matter may be dismissed.It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/24/2020. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES Signed by Clerk on 09/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Stewart. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Dennis Stewart.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #1 ADDED PDF - Envelope) (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less