This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 07:26:00 (UTC).

Stewart v. Caribbean Airlines Limited et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Stewart filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Caribbean Airlines Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02225

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andy Stewart

Defendants

ABM Aviation, Inc.

Global Elite Group Inc.

Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey

Caribbean Airlines Limited

Global Security Associates LLC

ABM Janitorial Services - Northeast, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony A. Ferrante

Attorney at Levine and Wiss, PLLC

510 Hempstead Turnpike, Suite 206

West Hempstead, NY 11552

Joel L. Levine

Attorney at LEVINE AND WISS PLLC

510 Hempstead Turnpike

West Hempstead, NY 11552

Scott Lawrence Wiss

Attorney at Levine and Wiss, PLLC

510 Hempstead Turnpike

West Hempstead, NY 11552

Justin Stephen Curtis

Attorney at Levine & Wiss PLLC

510 Hempstead Turnpike, Suite 206

W. Hempstead, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

John R. Oh

Attorney at FisherBroyles LLP

445 Park Avenue, Ninth Floor

New York, NY 10022

Matthew J. Bizzaro

Attorney at L'Abbate, Balkan, Colavita & Contini, LLP

1001 Franklin Avenue 3Rd Floor

Garden City, NY 11530

John Maggio

Attorney at Condon & Forsyth LLP

7 Times Square, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Curtis for plaintiff, Maggio for Caribbean, Oh for ABM, Bizzaro for Global defendants. Plaintiff will attempt to accomplish service on defendant Port Authority. Discovery will be limited to document demands and production, including production by plaintiff of authorizations to obtain medical records, between now and the appearance of all parties. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FURTHER TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AT 11:00 AM ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2020. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#11

(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Andy Stewart (Curtis, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. Levine on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Levine, Joel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lawrence Wiss on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Wiss, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

8 #1

Chamber's Individual Rules

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on June 25, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel shall confer with each other, complete the attached initial conference questionnaire and electronically file two days prior to the conference. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Stephen Curtis on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Curtis, Justin) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Bizzaro on behalf of Global Elite Group Inc., Global Security Associates LLC (aty to be noticed) (Bizzaro, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oh, John) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Caribbean Airlines Limited. (Maggio, John) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caribbean Airlines Limited from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 7021843/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Maggio, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Curtis for plaintiff, Maggio for Caribbean, Oh for ABM, Bizzaro for Global defendants. Plaintiff will attempt to accomplish service on defendant Port Authority. Discovery will be limited to document demands and production, including production by plaintiff of authorizations to obtain medical records, between now and the appearance of all parties. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FURTHER TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AT 11:00 AM ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2020. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Andy Stewart (Curtis, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. Levine on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Levine, Joel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lawrence Wiss on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Wiss, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on June 25, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel shall confer with each other, complete the attached initial conference questionnaire and electronically file two days prior to the conference. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Stephen Curtis on behalf of Andy Stewart (aty to be noticed) (Curtis, Justin) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Bizzaro on behalf of Global Elite Group Inc., Global Security Associates LLC (aty to be noticed) (Bizzaro, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oh, John) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Caribbean Airlines Limited. (Maggio, John) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketFILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12808940 (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caribbean Airlines Limited from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 7021843/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Maggio, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM Janitorial Services Northeast, inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Caribbean Airlines Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Port Authority of New York and New Jersey is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant