This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 08:48:42 (UTC).

Stewart v. Arkansas Department of Correction

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Stewart filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Arkansas Department of Correction. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee P. Rudofsky and Edie R. Ervin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00925

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee P. Rudofsky

Referral Judge

Edie R. Ervin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Dewayne Stewart

Malvern, AR 72104

Defendant

Arkansas Department of Correction

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (ldb) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#3

(#3) RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending #1 Petitioner Phillip Stewart's 2254 habeas petition be dismissed; and recommending the #2 motion to appoint counsel be denied as moot. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/22/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#4

(#4) OBJECTION to #3 Recommendation that #2 motion to appoint counsel be denied as moot by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (ldb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

(#5) OBJECTION to #3 Recommended Disposition by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (ldb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Prisoner Accounts by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (llg) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

7 #7

Main Document - Filed in Error (Disregard)

7 #1

Main Document - Correct

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 MOTION for Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of file mark) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #7 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (llg) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER denying, without prejudice, Petitioner Phillip Stewart's 2254 habeas petition; and denying as moot #2 motion to appoint counsel. This case will be closed. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/10/2021. (llg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT: Consistent with #10 Order entered on this date, the petition is denied without prejudice. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/10/2021. (llg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JUDGMENT: Consistent with #10 Order entered on this date, the petition is denied without prejudice. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/10/2021. (llg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying, without prejudice, Petitioner Phillip Stewart's 2254 habeas petition; and denying as moot #2 motion to appoint counsel. This case will be closed. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/10/2021. (llg) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (llg) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 MOTION for Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of file mark) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #7 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Order by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Prisoner Accounts by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (llg) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OBJECTION to #3 Recommended Disposition by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (ldb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OBJECTION to #3 Recommendation that #2 motion to appoint counsel be denied as moot by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (ldb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending #1 Petitioner Phillip Stewart's 2254 habeas petition be dismissed; and recommending the #2 motion to appoint counsel be denied as moot. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/22/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (ldb) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Phillip Dewayne Stewart. (llg) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arkansas Department of Corrections is a litigant