This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 09:17:44 (UTC).

Stewart Title Guaranty Company v. Avance Title LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Stewart Title Guaranty Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Avance Title LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gina L Simms and Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-03026

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gina L Simms

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stewart Title Guaranty Company

Defendants

Avance Title LLC

Arturo Vasquez

Carlos Vasquez

Soledad Herrera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark W Schweitzer

Attorney at MCNAMEE, HOSEA, JERNIGAN, KIM, GREENAN & LYNCH, P.A.

6411 Ivy Lane Ste 200

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Aaron Drew Neal

Attorney at McNamee Hosea

6411 Ivy Lane, Suite 200

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Defendant Attorney

John Peter Glaws, IV

Attorney at Carr Maloney PC

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Ste 8001

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/14/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #11 Waiver of Service Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed by Soledad Herrera, Arturo Vasquez, Carlos Vasquez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glaws, John) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Avance Title LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Carlos Vasquez served on 12/12/2021, answer due 1/3/2022.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Soledad Herrera served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Arturo Vasquez served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) Correspondence re: Request for Leave to File Motion (Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 11/29/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Avance Title LLC, Soledad Herrera, Arturo Vasquez, Carlos Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stewart Title Guaranty Company identifying Corporate Parent Stewart Information Services Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for Stewart Title Guaranty Company.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #4

Summons Summons to C. Vasquez

1 #3

Summons Summons to A. Vasquez

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9625067.), filed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to S. Herrera, #3 Summons Summons to A. Vasquez, #4 Summons Summons to C. Vasquez, #5 Summons Summons to Avance Title)(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/14/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Soledad Herrera, Arturo Vasquez, Carlos Vasquez or counsel for Soledad Herrera, Arturo Vasquez, Carlos Vasquez are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/13/2022. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #11 Waiver of Service Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed by Soledad Herrera, Arturo Vasquez, Carlos Vasquez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glaws, John) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Avance Title LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Carlos Vasquez served on 12/12/2021, answer due 1/3/2022.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Soledad Herrera served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. Arturo Vasquez served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correspondence re: Request for Leave to File Motion (Neal, Aaron) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 11/29/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Stewart Title Guaranty Company or counsel for Stewart Title Guaranty Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/13/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Avance Title LLC, Soledad Herrera, Arturo Vasquez, Carlos Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stewart Title Guaranty Company identifying Corporate Parent Stewart Information Services Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for Stewart Title Guaranty Company.(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9625067.), filed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to S. Herrera, #3 Summons Summons to A. Vasquez, #4 Summons Summons to C. Vasquez, #5 Summons Summons to Avance Title)(Schweitzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stewart Titile Guaranty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Peter Glaws Esquire IV