This case was last updated from PACER on 03/28/2020 at 10:41:25 (UTC).

Stewart et al v. Hensley et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Stewart filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hensley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Courtney Stewart

Defendants

Travis Hanshaw

Unknown Doctors, Nurses & Medical Care Providers of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.

Gustavo Guzman

Joshua Miller

D. Patrick

Unknown Employees and/or Agents of Boyd County Detention Center

David A. Voss

Susan Yeargin

Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.

William Hensley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert R. Waters

Attorney at Waters Law Group, PLLC

12802 Towne Park Way, Suite 200

Louisville, KY 40243

Cheryl R. Winn

Attorney at Waters Law Group, PLLC

12802 Towne Park Way, Suite 200

Louisville, KY 40243

Tracy D. Frye

Attorney at Frye Law Offices, PSC

404 Ferry Street, P.O. Box 411

Russell, KY 41169

Corey M. Thomas

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey C. Mando

Attorney at Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC

40 W. Pike Street

Covington, KY 41011

Christopher J. Leopold

Attorney at O'Bryan, Brown & Toner - Louisville

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 2200

Louisville, KY 40202

David S. Strite

Attorney at O'Bryan, Brown & Toner, PLLC

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 2200

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Record - Complaint

1 #2

State Court Record - Answer

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Courtney Stewart(As Administratrix of the Estate of Christopher Hall, Deceased), Courtney Stewart(as Next Friend, Guradian and Mother of Infant Child, L.H.) of Service of Discovery Requests to Defendant ACH. (Waters, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc..(Strite, David) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Gustavo Guzman, Gustavo Guzman, Travis Hanshaw, Travis Hanshaw, William Hensley, William Hensley.(Mando, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Courtney Stewart(As Administratrix of the Estate of Christopher Hall, Deceased), Courtney Stewart(as Next Friend, Guradian and Mother of Infant Child, L.H.) of Service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures (Waters, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) NLT 5/1/20 parties FILE motions to amend and join additional parties; 2) NLT 8/1/20 pla DISCLOSE expert witnesses; 2A) NLT 9/1/20 deft DISCLOSE expert witnesses; 3) NLT 30 days therafter parties DISCLOSE rebuttal witnesses; 4) NLT 1/1/21 counsel complete discovery; 5) NLT 2/1/21 parties FILE dispositive motions; 6) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 4/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in ASHLAND before Judge Henry R. Wilhoit Jr.; 7) NLT SEVEN (7) DAYS prior to PTC parties to file with the Clerk, submit to the Court and provide to opposing counsel, copies of witness list and summary of testimony, LIST OF EXHIBITS, PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM; 8) NLT SEVEN (7) DAYS prior to PTC parties shall pre-mark and provide to opposing counsel and Court's chambers, a copy of all exhibits; 9) NLT SEVEN (7) DAYS prior to PTC parties shall formulate AGREED proposed jury instructions; 10) At the time of the PTC, parties shall electronically FILE and SUBMIT copy to the Court of AGREED proposed jury instructions; 11) At the time of the PTC, parties shall electronically FILE, shall SUBMIT copy to Court, and PROVIDE opposing counsel all objections to discovery materials. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/20/20.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLS) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/19/2020 to add filers (JLS). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.. (Leopold, Christopher) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gustavo Guzman(In His Capacity as Agent and Employee of Boyd County Detention Center), Gustavo Guzman(Individually), Travis Hanshaw(In His Capacity as Agent and Employee of Boyd County Detention Center), Travis Hanshaw(Individually), William Hensley(Individually), William Hensley(In His Capacity As Jailer of the Boyd County Detention Center).(Mando, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: NLT 2/20/20 parties CONDUCT meeting to discuss possible settlement and develop a discovery plan; 2) at meeting parties EXCHANGE disclosures and make supplementals as required; 3) NLT 3/5/20 parties FILE joint Rule 26 report. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/29/20.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER : The removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/29/20.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Christopher J. Leopold. Answer to Complaint, has been filed by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal. (JLS) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., D. Patrick, Unknown Doctors, Nurses & Medical Care Providers of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., Susan Yeargin. Contained as part of the State Court Record in DE #1 as Exhibit 2.(JLS) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyd County Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-0130. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4578756), filed by Courtney Stewart(As Administratrix of the Estate of Christopher Hall, Deceased), Courtney Stewart(as Next Friend, Guradian and Mother of Infant Child, L.H.). (Attachments: #1 State Court Record - Complaint, #2 State Court Record - Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLS) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert R. Waters(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl R. Winn