This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 07:15:51 (UTC).

Steves and Sons, Inc. v. Jeld-Wen, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Steves and Sons, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jeld-Wen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steves and Sons, Inc.

Defendant

Jeld-Wen, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lewis Franklin Powell, III

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

951 E Byrd St, Riverfront Plaza

Richmond, VA 23219

Michael Randolph Shebelskie

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

951 E Byrd St, Riverfront Plaza

Richmond, VA 23219

Maya Miriam Eckstein

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

951 E Byrd St, Riverfront Plaza

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorney

Brian Charles Riopelle

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Richmond)

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily Claire Curran-Huberty and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7075959. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Seal by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#10

(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Glenn Pomerantz and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076002. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Steves and Sons, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Seal (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER. See for deadlines. On March 3, 2020 at 9:30 A.M., the Court will take testimony and hear oral argument on PLAINTIFF STEVES AND SONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF No. #2 ); and Unless the parties are able to reach an agreement regarding doorskin shipments, the Court will hold a status conference on February 18, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 02/14/2020. (nbrow) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#11

(#11) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle Mach and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076015. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marvin Grady Pipkin and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076029. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) Complaint REDACTED ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7075530.), filed by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Powell, Lewis) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/14/2020) (jsmi, ). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#14

(#14) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Omnibus Hearing held on 2/14/2020. See for deadlines. Status Conference set for 02/18/2020 at 10:00 a.m.; Oral argument on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #2 ) set for 03/03/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Peppy Peterson, OCR.) (nbrow) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER that the Court has directed counsel to confer and to tender a schedule for expedited proceedings in Steves II. That schedule, once approved, will be set out in a separate order. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/14/2020. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#16

(#16) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kortney Kloppe-Orton and Certification of Local Counsel Maya M. Eckstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076617. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Eckstein, Maya) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kortney Kloppe-Orton and Certification of Local Counsel Maya M. Eckstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076617. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Eckstein, Maya) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSet Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/3/2020 at 09:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER. See for deadlines. On March 3, 2020 at 9:30 A.M., the Court will take testimony and hear oral argument on PLAINTIFF STEVES AND SONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF No. #2 ); and Unless the parties are able to reach an agreement regarding doorskin shipments, the Court will hold a status conference on February 18, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 02/14/2020. (nbrow) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Omnibus Hearing held on 2/14/2020. See for deadlines. Status Conference set for 02/18/2020 at 10:00 a.m.; Oral argument on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #2 ) set for 03/03/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Peppy Peterson, OCR.) (nbrow) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER that the Court has directed counsel to confer and to tender a schedule for expedited proceedings in Steves II. That schedule, once approved, will be set out in a separate order. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/14/2020. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marvin Grady Pipkin and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076029. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle Mach and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076015. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Glenn Pomerantz and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076002. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily Claire Curran-Huberty and Certification of Local Counsel Lewis F. Powell, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7075959. by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Steves and Sons, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Seal (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Sealed Memorandum in Support re #3 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Sealed Complaint re #1 Complaint. (Powell, Lewis) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/14/2020) (jsmi, ). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Seal filed by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Seal by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Lewis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint REDACTED ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7075530.), filed by Steves and Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Powell, Lewis) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/14/2020) (jsmi, ). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.