This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 07:24:01 (UTC).

Stevenson et al v. Capps

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Stevenson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Capps. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Cage Tarver Stevenson

Sharyn Stevenson

James E Stevenson, III

Mary K Stevenson

Defendant

Ronald Capps, Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Michael Thomas

Attorney at Gibson & Thomas, P.A.

Post Office Box 686

Osceola, AR 72370

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Lee Hayes

Attorney at Jenkins Dedmon Hayes Law Group LLP

426 Troy Avenue

Dyersburg, TN 38025

William Lewis Jenkins, Jr.

Attorney at Jenkins Dedmon Hayes Law Group LLP

426 Troy Avenue

Dyersburg, TN 38025

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) RECEIPT for Hearing Exhibits by Defendant. (slb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#23

(#23) RECEIPT for Hearing Exhibits by Plaintiffs. (slb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#22

(#22) Hearing WITNESS AND EXHIBIT List. (slb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes William Lewis Jenkins, Jr. to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse in Jonesboro for a hearing in this case on 9/19/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/17/2019. (jak) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER denying #3 Motion to dismiss without prejudice. The Court will hold a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction as supplement, No. #9 & #10 , on 9/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. at the Gathings Federal Building in Jonesboro, Arkansas. #11 Motion to file amended petition is granted. Capps's response is due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/2019. (jak) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

18 #1

Affidavit

#18

(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #10 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#19) ORDER denying #3 Motion to dismiss without prejudice. The Court will hold a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction as supplement, No. #9 & #10 , on 9/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. at the Gathings Federal Building in Jonesboro, Arkansas. #11 Motion to file amended petition is granted. Capps's response is due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/2019. (jak) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/20/2019. Bench Trial set for 3/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/2/2019. (slb) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#5

(#5) RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT073197. (bmd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Capps, Jr. (Jenkins, William) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

3 #1

Affidavit Exhibit A - Declaration of Ronald E. Capps, Jr.

#3

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Second Supplemental filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) PETITION to Quiet Title, for Ejectment, for Declaratory Judgment, For Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, and Combined Complaint for Trepass against All Defendants, filed by Mary Cage Tarver Stevenson, Sharyn Stevenson, James E Stevenson, III(jak) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ronald Capps, Jr from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 47BCV-19-145. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RECEIPT for Hearing Exhibits by Defendant. (slb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RECEIPT for Hearing Exhibits by Plaintiffs. (slb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Hearing WITNESS AND EXHIBIT List. (slb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#21) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for motion hearing held on 19 September 2019 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. in Jonesboro, Arkansas: The Court heard testimony from Plaintiffs' witnesses 1 & 2 and Defense Witness 1. Plaintiffs' Exhibits 1-20 and Defendant's Exhibits 1 & 2 were admitted. The Court issued its ruling denying the motion. An Order will follow. (Attorney for Plaintiffs: Jeremy Thomas; Attorney for Defendant: W. Lewis Jenkins; and Court Reporter Kathy Maloney). (slb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes William Lewis Jenkins, Jr. to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse in Jonesboro for a hearing in this case on 9/19/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/17/2019. (jak) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER denying #3 Motion to dismiss without prejudice. The Court will hold a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction as supplement, No. #9 & #10 , on 9/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. at the Gathings Federal Building in Jonesboro, Arkansas. #11 Motion to file amended petition is granted. Capps's response is due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/2019. (jak) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #10 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #10 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ronald Capps, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ronald E Capps Jr)(Jenkins, William) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Second Supplemental filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #13 & #14 , granted. Response due by noon on 4 September 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 09/03/2019. (crw) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Supplemental filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Thomas, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/20/2019. Bench Trial set for 3/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/2/2019. (slb) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT073197. (bmd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Capps, Jr. (Jenkins, William) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by Ronald Capps, Jr (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Declaration of Ronald E. Capps, Jr.)(Jenkins, William) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION to Quiet Title, for Ejectment, for Declaratory Judgment, For Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, and Combined Complaint for Trepass against All Defendants, filed by Mary Cage Tarver Stevenson, Sharyn Stevenson, James E Stevenson, III(jak) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ronald Capps, Jr from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 47BCV-19-145. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.