This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 07:30:56 (UTC).

Stevens v. Zimmer, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Stevens filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Zimmer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee Stevens

Defendants

Zimmer Holdings, Inc.

Zimmer, U.S., Inc.

Zimmer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter A. Sandberg

Attorney at Ingaldson Fitzgerald, P.C.

813 W 3Rd Avenue

Anchorage, AK 99501

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Singer

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP (AK)

420 L Street, Suite 400

Anchorage, AK 99501

Lee Colin Baxter

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP (AK)

420 L Street, Suite 400

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing Documents from Superior Court by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet. (Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 3AN-19-04809 CI. ( Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015454), filed by Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CT0-134): Pursuant to Rule 7. I of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 2$ U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of June 9,2010, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing Documents from Superior Court by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Civil Cover Sheet. (Baxter, Lee) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 3AN-19-04809 CI. ( Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015454), filed by Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.