This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2019 at 08:07:37 (UTC).

Stevens v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Stevens filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00184

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albertina Stevens

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Myron E. Angstman

Attorney at Angstman Law Office

Po Box 585

Bethel, AK 99559

Joshua F. Fannon

Attorney at Law Offices of Joshua Fannon

550 S. Alaska Street, Suite 203

Palmer, AK 99645

Defendant Attorney

John A. Fonstad

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Anch)

222 West 7Th Avenue, Rm 253 #9

Anchorage, AK 99513

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY CASE PENDING COMPLETION OF ADMINISTRATIVE EXHAUSTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. In particular:(1) This lawsuit is stayed until January 9, 2020 and (2) In the event that this claim is not resolved administratively, the United States shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 07/09/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

3 #1

U.S. Attorney General

#3

(#3) Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015882.), filed by Albertina Stevens.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY CASE PENDING COMPLETION OF ADMINISTRATIVE EXHAUSTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. In particular:(1) This lawsuit is stayed until January 9, 2020 and (2) In the event that this claim is not resolved administratively, the United States shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 07/09/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Joint MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015882.), filed by Albertina Stevens.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Anthony Fonstad