This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:24:07 (UTC).

Stevens v. Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Stevens filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00277

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Char Stevens

Defendant

Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jean Walpole Coulter

Attorney at Jean Walpole Coulter & Associates Inc

406 S Boulder Ste 712

Tulsa, OK 74103

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Lee Carr

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner

429 Ne 50Th St 2Nd Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73105-1815

Ambre Camille Gooch

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner

429 Ne 50Th St 2Nd Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73105-1815

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; transferring case (terminates case) ; granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District - Eastern District of Oklahoma by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/19/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre Camille Gooch on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Ambre Camille Gooch added to party Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Lee Carr on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Status Report

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number CJ-19-0137 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2056340) by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (With attachments) (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • ***Remark: Case transferred from Oklahoma Northern has been opened in Eastern District of Oklahoma as case 6:19-cv-00177, filed 06/05/2019. (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #9 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; transferring case (terminates case) ; granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District - Eastern District of Oklahoma by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/19/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre Camille Gooch on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Ambre Camille Gooch added to party Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Lee Carr on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number CJ-19-0137 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2056340) by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (With attachments) (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma by Char Stevens (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ambre C Gooch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L. Carr