This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 08:31:19 (UTC).

STEVEN DEON TURNER JR. v. M. DAILO et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 STEVEN DEON TURNER JR filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against M DAILO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06688

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.

Tehachapi, CA 93581

Defendants

M. Dailo

A Miles

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees #2 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) Frivolous, malicious, or fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Unintelligible claim. State prisoner asserts to clear federal civil rights violation or other bases for federal court jurisdiction. This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Central District of California. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/26/2020. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/06/2020. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/25/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against A. MILES, M. DAILO with Jury Demand, COMPLAINT against A. MILES, M. DAILO with Jury Demand filed by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees #2 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) Frivolous, malicious, or fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Unintelligible claim. State prisoner asserts to clear federal civil rights violation or other bases for federal court jurisdiction. This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Central District of California. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/26/2020. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/06/2020. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against A. MILES, M. DAILO with Jury Demand, COMPLAINT against A. MILES, M. DAILO with Jury Demand filed by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/22/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.] (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less