This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 07:49:02 (UTC).

Steve Walker v. World of Jeans and Tops et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Steve Walker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against World of Jeans and Tops. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Walker

Defendants

Does 1-10

World of Jeans & Tops

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert D Coviello has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Robert Coviello may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker(Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#16

(#16) STATEMENT for case filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker (Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting #10 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Defendant. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 5/20/2020. (gk) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to World of Jeans and Tops answer now due 3/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant World of Jeans and Tops.(Loewy, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#13

(#13) OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #10 filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker. (Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bryan Barnet Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Steve Walker (Attorney Bryan Barnet Miller added to party Steve Walker(pty:pla))(Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steve Walker, upon Defendant World of Jeans and Tops served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trisha Rosano in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant World of Jeans and Tops. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party World of Jeans and Tops(pty:dft)) (Loewy, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant World of Jeans and Tops. (car) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Steve Walker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25180795 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Steve Walker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Steve Walker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert D Coviello has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Robert Coviello may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker(Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATEMENT for case filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker (Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting #10 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Defendant. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 5/20/2020. (gk) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to World of Jeans and Tops answer now due 3/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant World of Jeans and Tops.(Loewy, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #10 filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker. (Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bryan Barnet Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Steve Walker (Attorney Bryan Barnet Miller added to party Steve Walker(pty:pla))(Miller, Bryan) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steve Walker, upon Defendant World of Jeans and Tops served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trisha Rosano in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant World of Jeans and Tops. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party World of Jeans and Tops(pty:dft)) (Loewy, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant World of Jeans and Tops. (car) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Steve Walker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steve Walker. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25180795 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Steve Walker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Steve Walker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.