This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 09:40:38 (UTC).

Sterling Insurance Company et al v. Broan-Nutone, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Sterling Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-Nutone, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03316

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sterling Insurance Company

William Romeo

Defendant

Broan-Nutone, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David Scott Osterman

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP (NJ)

902 Carnegie Center, St 100

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/19/2021) (ks) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osterman, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-Nutone, LLC. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osterman, David) Modified on 4/16/2021 (gp). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/19/2021) (ks) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osterman, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: William Romeo. The party was added to the case in error. (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sterling Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Scott Osterman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 385 (Prop. Damage Prod. Liability);. (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-Nutone, LLC. Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC..(Osterman, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Osterman, David) Modified on 4/16/2021 (gp). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Dutchess. Case Number: 2021-51102. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24405508).Document filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Summons).(Osterman, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Scott Osterman