This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:50:27 (UTC).

STEPP v. EUCLID FISH COMPANY, INC. CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 STEPP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EUCLID FISH COMPANY, INC CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00717

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANNY STEPP

Defendant

EUCLID FISH COMPANY, INC. CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon Russell Keller

Attorney at Simon and Simon P.C.

707 Grant Street, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Errata re #1 Complaint by DANNY STEPP. Reason for Correction: Corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Keller, Brandon) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EUCLID FISH COMPANY, INC. CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5610895), filed by DANNY STEPP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) Civil Cover Sheet removed from view, redocketed as an errata at #2 . Modified on 7/8/2020 (ma). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Errata re #1 Complaint by DANNY STEPP. Reason for Correction: Corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Keller, Brandon) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EUCLID FISH COMPANY, INC. CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5610895), filed by DANNY STEPP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) Civil Cover Sheet removed from view, redocketed as an errata at #2 . Modified on 7/8/2020 (ma). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less