Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:42:42 (UTC).

Mark Stepniak et al v. FCA US LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Mark Stepniak filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02467

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mark Stepniak

M-Step Logistics, Inc.

Defendants

FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

FCA US, LLC

Interested Party

FCA North America Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin A Alexander, II

Attorney at Law Offices of William R McGee APLC

701 Palomar Airport Road Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92011

William R McGee

Attorney at William McGee Law Offices

701 Palomar Airport Road Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Deanna M Wallace

Attorney at Law Office of William R McGee

701 Palomar Airport Road Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Brigitte M Mayo

Attorney at RoseWaldorf LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90802

Mark W Skanes

Attorney at RoseWaldorf LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90802

Michael J Gregg

Attorney at RoseWaldorf LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Discovery cut-off 8/25/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 10/26/2020. Motions due by 9/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Law and Motion Cut-off 10/19/20 at 1:30 p.m. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT of JOINT 26f RULE REPORT filed by Plaintiffs M-Step Logistics, Inc., Mark Stepniak. (Wallace, Deanna) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#8

(#8) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/3/2020. (rrp) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on December 19, 2019. (Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, (Attorney Brigitte M Mayo added to party FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:dft))(Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2019-01113232-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24990106 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA North America Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Attorney Brigitte M Mayo added to party FCA North America Holdings, LLC (pty:ip))(Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Discovery cut-off 8/25/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 10/26/2020. Motions due by 9/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Law and Motion Cut-off 10/19/20 at 1:30 p.m. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of JOINT 26f RULE REPORT filed by Plaintiffs M-Step Logistics, Inc., Mark Stepniak. (Wallace, Deanna) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/3/2020. (rrp) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant FCA US, LLC. (filed in state court 12/19/2019, submitted as document 1, attachment 1)(esa) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, FCA US, LLC, filed by plaintiffs Mark Stepniak, M-Step Logistics, Inc. (filed in state court 11/20/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on December 19, 2019. (Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, (Attorney Brigitte M Mayo added to party FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:dft))(Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2019-01113232-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24990106 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA North America Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Attorney Brigitte M Mayo added to party FCA North America Holdings, LLC (pty:ip))(Mayo, Brigitte) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA NORTH AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brigitte M Mayo