Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2021 at 11:03:45 (UTC).

Stephenson v. Railcrew Xpress

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 Stephenson filed an Other lawsuit against Railcrew Xpress. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-06054

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debra Stephenson

Defendant

Railcrew Xpress

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin A Graham

Attorney at Graham Law Group, PC

11 East Kansas

Liberty, MO 64068

Brooke Amos Davids

Attorney at TGH Litigation LLC

11 East Kansas

Liberty, MO 64068

Defendant Attorneys

Jeannie M. DeVeney

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC-KCMO Walnut

1201 Walnut, Ste. 1450

Kansas City, MO 64106

Whitney Fay

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC-KCMO Walnut

1201 Walnut, Ste. 1450

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Debra Stephenson (Graham, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#31

(#31) ORDER granting #30 motion for approval of settlement. Signed on May 14, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

30 #1

Exhibit A

#30

(#30) Joint MOTION for order to Approve FLSA Settlement filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#29

(#29) ORDER denying #28 motion for leave to file settlement under seal. Signed on May 6, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#28

(#28) Joint MOTION for leave to file Under Seal filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#27

(#27) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 11:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 2/4/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #24 joint motion to amend/correct scheduling order. Signed on January 30, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#24

(#24) Joint MOTION to amend/correct #18 Scheduling Order, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#8

(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/12/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/26/2019. Signed on 7/12/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#9) First MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II, #7 Suggestions in Support of Motion To Dismiss filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 , #7 ) (Davids, Brooke) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#6

(#9) First MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II, #7 Suggestions in Support of Motion To Dismiss filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 , #7 ) (Davids, Brooke) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due July 2, 2019. Signed on May 31, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Order of Dismissal. In light of the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice #32 , all charges against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed on May 29, 20202, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Debra Stephenson (Graham, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #30 motion for approval of settlement. Signed on May 14, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Joint MOTION for order to Approve FLSA Settlement filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER denying #28 motion for leave to file settlement under seal. Signed on May 6, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Joint MOTION for leave to file Under Seal filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 11:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 2/4/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #24 joint motion to amend/correct scheduling order. Signed on January 30, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint on behalf of Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint MOTION to amend/correct #18 Scheduling Order, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II, #7 Suggestions in Support of Motion To Dismiss filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 , #7 ) (Davids, Brooke) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/12/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/26/2019. Signed on 7/12/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Railcrew Xpress. (Related document(s) #6 ) (DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due July 2, 2019. Signed on May 31, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Jeannie M. DeVeney added to party Railcrew Xpress(pty:dft))(DeVeney, Jeannie) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Railcrew Xpress. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Railcrew Xpress filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Filing fee $400, receipt number 36514D. Service due by 7/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Davids, Brooke) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney Fay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeannie M. DeVeney